SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-1463
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-1463
Title:
Missouri, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:
May 19, 2022
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-3725)
Decision Date:
April 11, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 12 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2022
Brief of respondents Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 21 2022
Amicus brief of Center for Medical Freedom, et al. not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (June 24, 2022)
Jun 21 2022
Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 06 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 09 2022
Reply of petitioners Missouri, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102
john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Missouri, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Biden, President of U.S., et al.
Other
William Jeffrey Olson
Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180
wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##