Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1453
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1453
Title:Joe A. Lynch, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:May 17, 2022
Linked with 21A467
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2067)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2022Application (21A467) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Mar 04 2022Application (21A467) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 16, 2022.
May 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joe Lynch
Blanket Consent
May 19 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, McDonough, Denis
Blanket Consent
May 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2022 to July 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2022.
Jun 13 2022Brief amicus curiae of Vietnam Veterans of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Swords to Plowshares and Connecticut Veterans Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2022Amicus brief of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium not accepted for filing. (June 21, 2022 -- duplicate submission)
Jun 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Texas A&M University School of Law Family and Veterans Advocacy Clinic filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2022 to August 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 18, 2022.
Aug 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 18, 2022 to September 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 15, 2022.
Sep 15 2022Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 28 2022Reply of petitioner Joe Lynch filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 31 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Ryan Lippman
    Counsel of Record
Veterans Law Group
13446 Poway Rd, Suite 338
Poway, CA 92064

mlippman@veteranslaw.com
8584565840
Party name: Joe Lynch
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc.
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
The Veterans Clinic University of Missouri
203 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211-4300

drakea@missouri.edu
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Doris Johnson Hines
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner
901 New York Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

dori.hines@finnegan.com
202-408-4250
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Theodore Augustus Howard
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

thoward@wiley.law
(202) 719-7120
Party name: Vietnam Veterans of America
Jennifer Librach Nall
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
303 Colorado Street
Suite 3000
Austin, TX 78701

jennifer.nall@us.dlapiper.com
(512) 457-7249
Party name: Swords to Plowshares and Connecticut Veterans Legal Center
Karon Leigh Rowden
    Counsel of Record
Texas A & M Law -Family & Veterans Advocacy Clinic
307 W 7th Street, LL50
Fort Worth, TX 76102

krowden@law.tamu.edu
682-225-6467
Party name: Texas A&M University School of Law Family and Veterans Advocacy Clinic

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543