Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-145
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-145
Title:Gordon College, et al., Petitioners
v.
Margaret DeWeese-Boyd
Docketed:August 3, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12988)
   Decision Date:March 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gordon College, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.
Aug 17 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Margaret DeWeese-Boyd
Blanket Consent
Aug 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association of Christian Schools International filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and Agudath Israel of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of The Cardinal Newman Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Benedictine College, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Nebraska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Gordon College, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Hillary Ada Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Fair Work, P.C.
192 South Street, Suite 450
Boston, MA 02111

hillary@fairworklaw.com
6176073261
Party name: Margaret DeWeese-Boyd
Other
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: Nebraska, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virginia
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
(864) 373-2352
Party name: Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al.
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Drive
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and Agudath Israel of America
Richard Wingfield Garnett IV
    Counsel of Record
Notre Dame Law School
P.O. Box R
Notre Dame, IN 46556-0780

rgarnett@nd.edu
574-631-6981
Party name: Benedictine College and Franciscan University of Steubenville
Cory Ren Liu
    Counsel of Record
Ashcroft Law Firm LLC
919 Congress, Ste 1325
Austin, TX 78701

cliu@ashcroftlawfirm.com
512-370-1800
Party name: Association of Christian Schools International
Tim Newton
    Counsel of Record
Murphy & Grantland, P.A.
Post Office Box 6648
Columbia, SC 29260

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
(803) 782-4100
Party name: National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference
Sharon Ann Rose
    Counsel of Record
CrossCastle PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

sharon.rose@crosscastle.com
2029605800
Party name: The Cardinal Newman Society, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543