Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1449
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1449
Title:Glacier Northwest, Inc., dba CalPortland, Petitioner
v.
International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 174
Docketed:May 16, 2022
Linked with 21A413
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(99319-0)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2022Application (21A413) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 16, 2022 to May 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 11 2022Application (21A413) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 13, 2022.
May 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2022 to July 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2022.
Jun 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022Brief of respondent International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 174 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 02 2022Reply of petitioner Glacier Northwest, Inc., d/b/a CalPortland filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Oct 27 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Glacier Northwest, Inc., d/b/a CalPortland
Blanket Consent
Nov 01 2022Brief of petitioner Glacier Northwest, Inc., d/b/a CalPortland filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 10, 2023.
Nov 16 2022Record requested from the Supreme Court of Washington.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

njfrancisco@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Glacier Northwest, Inc., d/b/a CalPortland
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Phair Barnard
    Counsel of Record
Barnard Iglitzin & Lavitt LLP
18 W. Mercer St.
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98119

barnard@workerlaw.com
206-257-6002
Party name: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 174
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street, Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142444422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Steven Paul Lehotsky
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

steve@lehotskykeller.com
5126938350
Party name: Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, et al.
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: The Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America
Glenn Matthew Taubman
    Counsel of Record
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

gmt@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543