Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1444
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1444
Title:Dolgen California, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Tricia Galarsa
Docketed:May 16, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Fifth Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(F082404)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 9, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2022 to July 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2022.
Jul 15 2022Brief of respondent Tricia Galarsa in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Nov 04 2022Judgment and mandate issued.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
804-775-4716
Party name: Dolgen California, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Glenn Ari Danas
    Counsel of Record
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
22525 Pacific Coast Highway
Malibu, CA 90265

gdanas@clarksonlawfirm.com
2137884050
Party name: Tricia Galarsa

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543