Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-144
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-144
Title:Seattle's Union Gospel Mission, Petitioner
v.
Matthew S. Woods
Docketed:August 3, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(96132-8)
   Decision Date:March 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Seattle's Union Gospel Mission
Blanket Consent
Aug 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Matthew S. Woods
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.
Aug 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Samaritan's Purse filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Westminster Theological Seminary filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2021Brief amici curiae of 20 Current and Former Washington State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Citygate Network filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Gospel Rescue Mission Fellowship, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of General Conference of the Seventh-day Adventists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Grace Youth and Family Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Kevin C. Walsh filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Brief amici curiae of American Association of Christian Schools, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Amicus brief of American Association of Christian Schools, et al. not accepted for filing. (Dupilicate submission) (September 08, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Seattle's Union Gospel Mission
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Denise DiskinQLaw Foundation of Washington
101 Yesler Way #300
Seattle, WA 98104

denise@qlawfoundation.org
206-483-2725
Party name: Matthew S. Woods
Other
George M. Ahrend
    Counsel of Record
Ahrend Law Firm PLLC
P.O. Box 816
457 1st Ave. N.W.
Ephrata, WA 98823

gahrend@ahrendlaw.com
(509) 764-9000
Party name: American Association of Christian Schools, Assoication for Biblical Higher Education, Association of Classical Christian Schools
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
843 606 0640
Party name: General Conference of the Seventh-day Adventists, et al.
Kevin Christian Walsh
    Counsel of Record
University of Richmond School of Law
203 Richmond Way
Richmond, VA 23173

kwalsh@richmond.edu
804-287-6018
Party name: Kevin C. Walsh
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
5403418808
Party name: The State of Montana, Montana Attorney General Austin Knudsen, and other Senior Montana State Attorneys
Kristine Lee Brown
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
8700 E Jefferson Ave #371703
Denver, CO 80237

kristi@kristiburtonbrown.com
302-515-2721
Party name: Westminster Theological Seminary
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, Administer Justice, New Covenant Legal Services, Access Justice, Christian Legal Aid of Arizona, Compassionate Counsel
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
(864) 373-2352
Party name: Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute and the Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Grace Youth and Family Foundation
David Michael Hurst Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Phelps Dunbar
4270 I-55 North
Jackson, MS 39211

mike.hurst@phelps.com
601-352-2300
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association
Michael Dean Karpeles
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60601

karpelesm@gtlaw.com
312-456-1076
Party name: Gospel Rescue Mission Fellowship, Market Street Mission, City Rescue Mission of Lansing, The Gospel Mission, and Sunday Breakfast Mission
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mccotter@boydengrayassociates.com
202-706-5488
Party name: Samaritan's Purse
Tim Newton
    Counsel of Record
Murphy & Grantland, P.A.
Post Office Box 6648
Columbia, SC 29260

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
(803) 782-4100
Party name: National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference
Steven T. O'Ban
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1575 S Seashore Drive
Tacoma, WA 98465

stevenoban@gmail.com
2533121688
Party name: Washington State Legislators
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543