Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1436
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1436
Title:Leon Santos-Zacaria, aka Leon Santos-Sacarias, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:May 12, 2022
Linked with 21A565
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-60355)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 30 2022Application (21A565) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 20, 2022 to May 20, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Mar 30 2022Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Apr 03 2022Application (21A565) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 10, 2022.
May 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 13, 2022 to July 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Jun 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 13, 2022.
Jul 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2022 to August 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Jul 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 12, 2022.
Aug 12 2022Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2022Reply of petitioner Leon Santos-Zacaria filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Oct 03 2022As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Nov 10 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 17, 2023.
Nov 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Nov 17 2022Brief of petitioner Leon Santos-Zacaria filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center and National Immigration Litigation Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Immigration Judges, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Legal Services Providers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Leon Santos-Zacaria
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Attorney General
Other
Dan L. Bagatell
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
3 Weatherby Road
Hanover, NH 03755

dbagatell@perkinscoie.com
6023518250
Party name: Former Immigration Judges and Former Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Legal Services Providers
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center & National Immigration Litigation Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543