Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1417
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1417
Title:Vaughn Hoeflin Standley, Petitioner
v.
Department of Energy
Docketed:May 4, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-2149)
   Decision Date:February 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Department of Energy to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vaughn H. Standley14410 Sedona Drive
Gainesville, VA 20155

(571) 723-5196
Party name: Vaughn Hoeflin Standley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Energy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543