Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1410
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1410
Title:Carol V. Clendening, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary J. Clendening, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 3, 2022
Linked with 21A446
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1878)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2022Application (21A446) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 28, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 23 2022Application (21A446) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 29, 2022.
Apr 29 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 2, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 08 2022Response Requested. (Due July 8, 2022)
Jun 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2022 to August 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 8, 2022.
Aug 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2022 to September 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2022.
Sep 07 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Reply of petitioner Carol V. Clendening filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Oct 05 2022Rescheduled.
Oct 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Oct 12 2022Rescheduled.
Oct 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 24 2022Rescheduled.
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Carol V. Clendening
Nicholas Frederick BakerNick Baker Law LLC
320 North Meridian Street
Suite 801
Indianapolis, IN 46204

nick@nickbakerlaw.com
3174567889
Party name: Carol V. Clendening
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543