Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1397
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1397
Title:In Re Grand Jury
Docketed:May 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55085, 21-55145)
   Decision Date:January 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2022Motion (21M105) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Apr 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022MOTION (21M105) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Motion (21M105) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.
May 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2022.
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of California Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 1, 2022.
Aug 01 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 12 2022Reply of petitioner In Re Grand Jury filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Oct 27 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, In Re Grand Jury
Blanket Consent
Nov 10 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 9, 2023.
Nov 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Nov 16 2022Brief of petitioner In Re Grand Jury filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022for Leave to File Joint Appendix Under Seal of In Re Grand Jury submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of Professional Responsibility Lawyers in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022Amicus brief of Washington Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2022Amicus brief of Silicon Valley Tax Directors Group submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of The Buckeye Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Atlantic Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Lawyers for Civil Justice submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of California Lawyers Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of American College of Tax Counsel submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Association of Corporate Counsel, and Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Federation of Defense & Corporate Counsel submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of American Bar Association submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Benjamin Levin
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles and Olson LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

daniel.levin@mto.com
213-683-9135
Party name: In Re Grand Jury
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: In Re Grand Jury
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jonathan Charles Bond
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jbond@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Silicon Valley Tax Directors Group
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Deborah Delores Enix-Ross
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654

amicusbriefs@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Mark David Harris
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mharris@proskauer.com
212-969-3530
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Hashim M. Mooppan
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

hmmooppan@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel
Arden J. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Harrang Long Gary Rudnick P.C.
497 Oakway Rd.
Ste. 380
Eugene, OR 97401

arden.j.olson@harrang.com
(541) 485-0220
Party name: Association of Professional Responsibility Lawyers
Eric Todd Presnell
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LL P
1600 Division Street
Suite 700
Nashville, TN 37203

tpresnell@bradley.com
6152442582
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy
Jonathan Michael Redgrave
    Counsel of Record
Redgrave LLP
4800 Westfields Boulevard
Suite 250
Chantilly, VA 20151

jredgrave@redgravellp.com
7035921155
Party name: Lawyers for Civil Justice
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@kramerlevin.com
(212) 715-9100
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Buchalter. A Professional Corporation
18400 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 800
Irvine, CA 92612

msungaila@buchalter.com
(949) 760-1121
Party name: Federation of Defense & Corporate Counsel
John S. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
680 Maine Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

jwilliams@wc.com
202-434-5646
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Association of Corporate Counsel, and Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
John S. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
680 Maine Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

jwilliams@wc.com
202-434-5646
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Lisa Schiavo BlattWilliams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Adria S. Price
    Counsel of Record
Price & Assoc., LLC
43 North Kringle Place
Post Office Box 100
Santa Claus, IN 47579

adria@pricelaw.net
812-937-4444
Party name: California Lawyers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543