Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1394
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1394
Title:John Fitisemanu, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:April 29, 2022
Linked with 21A494
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4017, 20-4019)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 27, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2022Application (21A494) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 27, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 10 2022Application (21A494) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until April 27, 2022.
Apr 11 2022Application (21A494) to extend further the time from April 27, 2022 to May 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Application (21A494) denied by Justice Gorsuch.
Apr 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2022 to June 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 30, 2022, for all respondents.
May 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Constitutional Law and Legal History filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Descendants of Dred Scott and Isabel Gonzalez filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Samoan Federation of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Virgin Islands Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Elected Officials of Guam, the Northern Mariana Islands, Puerto Rico, and the U.S. Virgin Islands filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Citizenship Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Federal and Local Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 30, 2022 to July 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 29, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: John Fitisemanu, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America, et al.
Michael Francis Williams
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland and Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.williams@kirkland.com
202-389-5000
Party name: American Samoa Government and the Hon. Aumua Amata
Other
Dwyer Stenquist Arce
    Counsel of Record
Kutak Rock LLP
1650 Farnam Street
The Omaha Building
Omaha, NE 68102

Dwyer.Arce@KutakRock.com
402.346.6000
Party name: Virgin Islands Bar Association
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
6468375151
Party name: Former Federal and Local Judges
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
6175266000
Party name: Scholars of Constitutional Law and Legal History
Steven Joseph Horowitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

shorowitz@sidley.com
(312) 853-7143
Party name: Citizenship Scholars
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Descendants of Dred Scott and Isabel Gonzalez
Cesar Antonio Lopez Morales
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

clopez-morales@orrick.com
202-339-8471
Party name: Samoan Federation of America, Inc.
Alejandro Agustin Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ortiza@aclu.org
3323233888
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
(202) 662-5987
Party name: Current and Former Elected Officials of Guam, the Northern Mariana Islands, Puerto Rico, and the U.S. Virgin Islands

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543