Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1393
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1393
Title:Clarence Alexander, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation, et al.
Docketed:April 29, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-35048)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 21, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2022Waiver of right of respondents Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation and Gwichyaa Zhee Gwich'in Tribal Government to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James M. Hackett
    Counsel of Record
James M. Hackett Law Offices
401 Eleventh Avenue
Fairbanks, AK 99701

jhackettlaw@aol.com
(907) 456-3626
Party name: Clarence Alexander and Demetrie (Dacho) Alexander
Attorneys for Respondents
Lee C. BaxterSchwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, P.C.
420 L Street, Suite 400
Anchorage, AK 99501

lbaxter@schwabe.com
907-339-7132
Party name: Gwitchyaa Zhee Corporation and Gwichyaa Zhee Gwich'in Tribal Government

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543