SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-1389
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-1389
Title:
Jeremy Bates, Petitioner
v.
Donald J. Trump, et al.
Docketed:
April 28, 2022
Linked with 21A646
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-1533)
Decision Date:
February 15, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2022
Application (21A646) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2022 to July 15, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Proof of Service
Apr 19 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 27 2022
Application (21A646) denied by Justice Sotomayor.
May 27 2022
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 16 2022
Request for recusal received from petitioner.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Charles Bates
Counsel of Record
Attorney and Counselor at Law
21 West Street Apt. 21J
New York, NY 10006-2931
jeremybates3@gmail.com
917-626-2473
Party name: Jeremy Bates
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##