Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1377
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1377
Title:The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland, et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, et al.
Docketed:April 25, 2022
Linked with 21A395
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B313278)
   Decision Date:October 20, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 17, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 03 2022Application (21A395) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2022 to April 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Application (21A411) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2022 to April 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Feb 07 2022Application (21A395) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 16, 2022.
Feb 10 2022Application (21A411) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 16, 2022.
Apr 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2022Waiver of right of respondent Plaintiffs and Real Parties in Interest John Doe, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 19 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops GRANTED.
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

njfrancisco@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Oakland, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Holly N. Boyer
    Counsel of Record
Esner, Chang & Boyer
234 East Colorado Boulevard
Suite 975
Pasadena, CA 91101

hboyer@ecbappeal.com
626-535-9860
Party name: Plaintiffs and Real Parties in Interest John Doe, et al.
Other
Mark Edward Chopko
    Counsel of Record
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
2000 K Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

mchopko@stradley.com
2024198410
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
Alexander Dushku
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
36 South State Street
Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

adushku@kmclaw.com
801 328 3600
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543