Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1372
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1372
Title:Hollie Adams, et al., Petitioners
v.
Teamsters Union Local 429, et al.
Docketed:April 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1824)
   Decision Date:January 20, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2022Waiver of right of respondents Attorney General Josh Shapiro, James M. Darby, Albert Mezzaroba, and Robert H. Shoop to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent County of Lebanon to respond filed.
Main Document
May 03 2022Waiver of right of respondent Teamsters Union Local 429 to respond filed.
Main Document
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 24 2022Response Requested. (Due June 23, 2022)
Jun 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 23, 2022 to August 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2022, for all respondents.
Aug 08 2022Brief of respondent County of Lebanon in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2022Brief of respondents Attorney General Josh Shapiro, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2022Brief of respondent Teamsters Union Local 429 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2022Reply of petitioners Hollie Adams, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 North Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Hollie Adams, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John R. Bielski
    Counsel of Record
Willig. Williams & Davidson
1845 Walnut Street, 24th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jbielski@wwdlaw.com
215-656-3652
Party name: Teamsters Union Local 429
Peggy Michele Morcom
    Counsel of Record
Morcom Law, LLC
226 W. Chocolate Avenue
Hershey, PA 17033

pmorcom@morcomlaw.com
17172981907
Party name: County of Lebanon
Claudia Margaret Tesoro
    Counsel of Record
1600 Arch Street
Suite 300
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ctesoro@attorneygeneral.gov
2155602908
Party name: Attorney General Josh Shapiro, James M. Darby, Albert Mezzaroba, and Robert H. Shoop
John R. BielskiWillig, Williams & Davidson
1845 Walnut Street, 24th Fl
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jbielski@wwdlaw.com
215-656-3652
Party name: Teamsters Union Local 429
Jessica Constance CaggianoWillig, Williams & Davidson
1845 Walnut Street. 24th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jcaggiano@wwdlaw.com
2156563618
Party name: Teamsters Union Local 429

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543