Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1370
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1370
Title:Spireon, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Procon Analytics, LLC
Docketed:April 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1954)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2022Brief of respondent Procon Analytics, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2022Reply of petitioner Spireon, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Bergstrand Jinkins
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Coburn LLP
One U.S. Bank Plaza
St. Louis, MO 63101

djinkins@thompsoncoburn.com
(314) 552-6000
Party name: Spireon, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Edward Dodson Lanquist Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Intellectual Property Law, P.C.
1600 Division Street, Suite 500
Nashville, TN 37203

edl@iplawgroup.com
6152422400
Party name: Procon Analytics, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543