Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1354
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1354
Title:Bast Amron LLP, Petitioner
v.
United States Trustee Region 21
Docketed:April 18, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12547)
   Decision Date:January 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2022Memorandum of respondent United States Trustee Region 21 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Siegel v. Fitzgerald, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Jul 29 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey P. Bast
    Counsel of Record
Bast Amron LLP
One Southeast Third Avenue
Suite 1400
Miami, FL 33131

jbast@bastamron.com
3053797904
Party name: Bast Amron LLP
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Trustee Region 21

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543