Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1335
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1335
Title:Waleed Khalid Abu Al-Waleed Al Hood Al-Qarqani, et al., Petitioners
v.
Saudi Arabian Oil Company
Docketed:April 7, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-20034)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Waiver of right of respondent Saudi Arabian Oil Company to respond filed.
Main Document
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 31 2022Petition DENIED.
Jun 27 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 01 2022Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edward Charles Chung
    Counsel of Record
Chung, Malhas and Mantel, PLLC
1037 NE 65th Street, Suite 80171
Seattle, WA 98115

Echung@cmmlawfirm.com
(206) 264-8999
Party name: Waleed Khalid Abu Al-Waleed Al Hood Al-Qarqani, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn Beth Lamm
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 13th St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

clamm@whitecase.com
(202) 626-3600
Party name: Saudi Arabian Oil Company

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543