Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1293
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1293
Title:John Albert Scudero, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Alaska
Docketed:March 25, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alaska
   Case Numbers:(S-17549)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 22, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2022Waiver of right of respondent State of Alaska to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Phillip Paul Weidner
    Counsel of Record
Phillip Paul Weidner & Associates APC
431 W. 7th Avenue
Suite 101
Anchorage, AK 99501

phillippaulw@gmail.com
907-276-1200
Party name: John Albert Scudero, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Laura Emily Wolff
    Counsel of Record
The State of Alaska
1031 4th Ave., Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

laura.wolff@alaska.gov
9072695193
Party name: State of Alaska

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543