Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1284
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1284
Title:Barry D. Romeril, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:March 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4197)
   Decision Date:September 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 21, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Blanket Consent
Apr 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2022 to May 23, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2022.
Apr 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Mark Cuban, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law & First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2022Brief of respondent United States Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 27 2022Reply of petitioner Barry D. Romeril filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Floyd Abrams
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
32 Old Slip
New York, NY 10005

fabrams@cahill.com
212-701-3621
Party name: Barry D. Romeril
Margaret Ann LittleNew Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695212
Party name: Barry D. Romeril
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
309 W. Washington St.
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Constitutional Law & First Amendment Scholars
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

tfrank@gmail.com
7032033848
Party name: Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
J. Mark Gidley
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005-3807

mgidley@whitecase.com
2026263609
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Shana-Tara O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
DUE PROCESS INSTITUTE
700 Pennsylvania Avenue SE #560
Washington, DC 20003

shana@idueprocess.org
2025586683
Party name: Due Process Institute
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al.
Thomas A. Zaccaro
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
515 S. Flower Street
25th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
213-683-6181
Party name: Mark Cuban, Phillip Goldstein, Elon Mush, Nelson Obus and Investor Choice Advocates Network

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543