Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1272
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1272
Title:Monsanto Company, Petitioner
v.
Alberta Pilliod, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2022
Linked with 21A369
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A158228)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 25, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 17, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2022Application (21A369) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2022 to March 17, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022Application (21A369) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 17, 2022.
Mar 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to May 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2022.
Apr 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondents Alberta Pilliod, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2022Reply of petitioner Monsanto Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 21 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Alberta Pilliod, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Monsanto Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Monsanto Company
Attorneys for Respondents
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Alberta Pilliod, et al.
Other
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543