Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1270
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1270
Title:MOAC Mall Holdings LLC, Petitioner
v.
Transform Holdco LLC, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20- 1846(L))
   Decision Date:December 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to May 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2022.
May 20 2022Brief of respondents Transform Holdco LLC and Sears Holdings Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
May 31 2022Reply of petitioner MOAC Mall Holdings LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2022. The time to file respondents' on the merits is extended to and including October 19, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: MOAC Mall Holdings LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
George Eric Brunstad Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
199 Lawrence Street
New Haven, CT 06511

Eric.Brunstad@dechert.com
860 524 3960
Party name: Transform Holdco LLC and Sears Holdings Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543