Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1268 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1268 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Joe Clarence Smith, Jr., Petitioner
v.
David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry, et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2022
Linked with 21A394
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17404)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2022Application (21A394) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2022 to March 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Application (21A394) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 16, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2022Brief of respondents David Shinn, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Breyer respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth F. Rossman IV
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Roca Rothberger Christie LLP
1601 19th Street
Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

krossman@lewisroca.com
3036239000
Party name: Joe Clarence Smith, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Lee Sparks
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jeffrey.sparks@azag.gov
6025428583
Party name: David Shinn, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543