Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1255
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1255
Title:Acres Bonusing, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Lester John Marston, et al.
Docketed:March 16, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-15959)
   Decision Date:November 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2022.
May 13 2022Brief of respondents Lester John Marston, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2022Reply of petitioners Acres Bonusing, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ronald Howard Blumberg
    Counsel of Record
Blumberg Law Group LLP
141 N. Acacia Ave.
Solana Beach, CA 92075

rhb@blumberglawgroup.com
(858) 509-0600
Party name: Acres Bonusing, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
George Forman
    Counsel of Record
Forman Shapiro & Rosenfeld LLP
5055 Lucas Valley Road
Nicasio, CA 94946

george@gformanlaw.com
4153022906
Party name: Lester John Martson, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543