Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1251
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1251
Title:Eric Ibarguen, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:March 16, 2022
Linked with 21A279
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(56)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Application (21A279) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 12, 2022 to March 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 31 2021Application (21A279) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 14, 2022.
Mar 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Waiver of State of New York of right to respond not accepted for filing. (April 01, 2022)
Apr 01 2022Waiver of State of New York of right to respond not accepted for filing. (April 01, 2022)
Apr 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clini
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
6507247081
Party name: Eric Ibarguen
Attorneys for Respondent
John M. Castellano
    Counsel of Record
125-01 Queens Boulevard
Kew Gardens, NY 11415

jmcastellano@queensda.org
718-286-5801
Party name: New York
Other
David A. Barrett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
212-446-2300
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543