Docket for 21-1239
 | |
|
Mar 11 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2022) | | Proof of ServicePetition | Mar 29 2022 | Brief of respondent Michelle Cochran filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Apr 08 2022 | Letter of April 8, 2022, from the Solicitor General filed. | | Main Document | Apr 11 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Raymond J. Lucia, Sr., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 12 2022 | Letter of April 12, 2022 from counsel for respondent filed. | | Main Document | Apr 13 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022. | | | May 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. | | | May 16 2022 | Petition GRANTED. | | | May 19 2022 | Letter of the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties in No. 21-86, Axon Enterprise, Inc. v. FTC, and No. 21-1239, SEC v. Cochran, regarding alignment of parties and briefing filed. | | Main Document | Jun 01 2022 | Upon consideration of the letter of May 19, 2022, from the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties in No. 21-86 and No. 21-1239, respondent in No. 21-1239 has to and including June 30, 2022, within which to file the joint appendix and the opening brief on the merits in No. 21-1239. The Solicitor General has to and including August 8, 2022, within which to file a consolidated response brief on the merits on behalf of the federal parties in No. 21-86 and No. 21-1239, limited to 20,000 words. | | | Jun 10 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Michelle Cochran | | Blanket Consent | Jun 16 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Securities and Exchange Commission, et al. | | Blanket Consent | Jun 30 2022 | Brief of respondent Michelle Cochran filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 30 2022 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 05 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | Jul 06 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Raymond J. Lucia, Sr., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Phillip Goldstein, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 07 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 03 2022 | ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, November 7, 2022. | | | Aug 08 2022 | Consolidated response brief of federal parties filed. VIDED (21-86). | | Main DocumentMain Document | Aug 31 2022 | CIRCULATED | | | Sep 08 2022 | Motion to file the reply brief on the merits out of time filed by respondent Michelle Cochran (October 3, 2022). | | Main Document | Sep 08 2022 | Reply of respondent Michelle Cochran filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 12 2022 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. | | | Sep 12 2022 | The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. | | | Sep 15 2022 | Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas has been electronically filed. | | | Oct 03 2022 | Motion to file the reply brief on the merits out of time GRANTED. | | | Nov 07 2022 | Argued. For Michelle Cochran: Gregory G. Garre, Washington, D. C. For Securities and Exchange Commission, et al.: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. | | |
|