Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1215
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1215
Title:Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:March 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1298)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2022 to May 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2022.
Apr 06 2022Brief amici curiae of David Codrea, Scott Heuman, Owen Monroe filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2022Brief amici curiae of States of Montana, West Virginia and 20 Other States in Support of Petitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022.
May 24 2022Brief of respondents Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2022Reply of petitioners Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 21 2022Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick, et al.
Other
David Morgan Steven Dewhirst
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: Brief of Amici Curiae States of Montana, West Virginia and 20 Other States in Support of Petitioners
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Stephen Dean Stamboulieh
    Counsel of Record
Stamboulieh Law, PLLC
PO Box 428
Olive Branch, MS 38654

stephen@sdslaw.us
601-852-3440
Party name: David Codrea, Scott Heuman, Owen Monroe

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543