Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1214
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1214
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Emmitt G. Sam
Docketed:March 7, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1300)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Apr 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2022 to May 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2022.
Apr 22 2022Motion of Emmitt G. Sam for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (April 25, 2022 - wrong file uploaded)
Apr 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2022 to May 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2022.
May 10 2022Brief of respondent Emmitt G. Sam in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Emmitt G. Sam.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
May 25 2022Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 13 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 21 2022Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Leonard Ritchie Powell
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LeonardPowell@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Emmitt G. Sam

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543