Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1195
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1195
Title:Alexandru Bittner, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-40597)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022.
Apr 01 2022Amicus brief of Center for Taxpayer Rights not accepted for filing. (April 01, 2022 -- Corrected e-filing to be submitted)
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Taxpayer Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2022 to May 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 17, 2022.
May 17 2022Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 19 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States
Blanket Consent
Jul 28 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Alexandru Bittner
Blanket Consent
Jul 28 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, November 2, 2022.
Aug 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 17, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 28, 2022.
Aug 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of American College of Trust and Estate Counsel in Support of Neither Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2022Further extension of time to file petitioner's brief on the merits to and including August 18, 2022. Further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including September 30, 2022.
Aug 18 2022Brief of petitioner Alexandru Bittner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2022Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Taxpayer Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2022CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 12 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

daniel.geyser@haynesboone.com
303-382-6219
Party name: Alexandru Bittner
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Caroline DeLisle Ciraolo
    Counsel of Record
Kostelanetz & Fink, LLP
601 New Jersey Avenue, N.W.
Suite 260
Washington, DC 20001

cciraolo@kflaw.com
(202) 875-8000
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel
Guinevere M. Moore
    Counsel of Record
Moore Tax Law Group LLC
2205 W Armitage Ave
Suite 1
Chicago, IL 60647

guinevere.moore@mooretaxlawgroup.com
3125499993
Party name: Center for Taxpayer Rights
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Arthur Grushkow Sapper
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
1909 K Street, N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

arthur.sapper@ogletreedeakins.com
202-263-0270
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, American Farm Bureau Federation, Restaurant Law Center, and Corn Refiners Association
David Edward Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Fabian Vancott
215 South State Street, Suite 1200
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

dsloan@fabianvancott.com
801-237-0423
Party name: American College of Trust and Estate Counsel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543