Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1181
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1181
Title:Lyndsey Ballinger, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Oakland, California
Docketed:February 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16550)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Lyndsey Ballinger, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2022.
Mar 30 2022Brief amici curiae of San Francisco Apartment Association and Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 29 2022Brief of respondent City of Oakland in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2022Reply of petitioners Lyndsey Ballinger, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
J. David Breemer
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

jbreemer@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Lyndsey Ballinger, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kevin Peter McLaughlin
    Counsel of Record
Oakland City Attorney's Office
One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza
Sixth Floor
Oakland, CA 94612

kmclaughlin@oaklandcityattorney.org
5102382961
Party name: City of Oakland
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.; Apartment Owners Association of California, Inc.; California Association of Realtors; California Rental Housing Association; Santa Barbara Apartment Association, Inc.
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Andrew M. Zacks
    Counsel of Record
Zacks, Freedman & Patterson, PC
601 Montgomery Street
Suite 400
San Francisco, CA 94111

az@zfplaw.com
(415) 956-8100
Party name: San Francisco Apartment Association and Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543