Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1162
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1162
Title:Erika Bailey-Johnson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-2351)
   Decision Date:November 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Julian Cragg
    Counsel of Record
Eckland & Blando
10 South Fifth Street, Suite 800
Minneapolis, MN 55402

dcragg@ecklandblando.com
6122360165
Party name: Erika Bailey-Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543