Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1158
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1158
Title:Joseph Percoco, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2990, 18-3710, 19-1272)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2022Application (21A298) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2022 to March 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jan 07 2022Application (21A298) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2022.
Feb 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2022 to April 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2022.
Mar 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022.
May 24 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2022Reply of petitioner Joseph Percoco filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 13 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2022.
Aug 31 2022Brief of petitioner Joseph Percoco filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentOtherOtherOtherOtherOtherProof of ServiceOther
Aug 31 2022Brief of respondent Steven Aiello in support of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 28, 2022.
Oct 18 2022Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 20 2022Motion for divided argument filed by respondent Steven Aiello in support of petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2022CIRCULATED.
Oct 28 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Oct 31 2022Record from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit has been electronically filed.
Nov 07 2022Motion for divided argument filed by respondent Steven Aiello in support of petitioner DENIED.
Nov 07 2022Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York. The documents are Sealed Impounded. ( One envelope ). Also one CD with Sealed documents has been electronically filed.
Nov 10 2022Reply of petitioner Joseph Percoco filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2022Reply of respondent Steven Aiello in support of petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 28 2022Argued. For petitioner: Jacob M. Roth, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Nicole F. Reaves, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Joseph Percoco
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato Bach LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
212 257-4880
Party name: Steven Aiello in support of petitioner
Other
Joshua Lewis Dratel
    Counsel of Record
29 Broadway
Suite 1412
New York, NY 10006

jdratel@joshuadratel.com
2127320707
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Gary Michael Lawkowski
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 402
Alexandria, VA 22314

GLawkowski@dhillonlaw.com
703-965-0330
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and the Presidential Coalition
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543