Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1154
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1154
Title:Speech & Language Center, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey
Docketed:February 22, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Jersey
   Case Numbers:(085263, A-66 September Term 2020)
   Decision Date:December 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2022Brief of respondent Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael James Confusione
    Counsel of Record
Hegge & Confusione
P.O. Box 366
Mullica Hill, NJ 08062

mc@heggelaw.com
8562875733
Party name: Speech & Language Center, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas S. Cosma
    Counsel of Record
Connell Foley LLP
56 Livingston Avenue
Roseland, NJ 07068

tcosma@connellfoley.com
(973) 535-0500
Party name: Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543