Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1153
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1153
Title:Waleed Khalid Abu Al-Waleed Al Hood Al-Qarqani, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chevron Corporation, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17074)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 16, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent Chevron Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 16 2022Response Requested. (Due April 15, 2022)
Mar 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2022.
May 16 2022Brief of respondents Chevron Corporation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
May 31 2022Reply of petitioners Waleed Khalid Abu Al-Waleed Al Hood Al-Qarqani, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2022Letter of June 15, 2022 from counsel for petitioners received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.
Jul 18 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2022DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 22 2022Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edward Charles Chung
    Counsel of Record
Chung, Malhas and Mantel, PLLC
1037 NE 65th Street
Suite 80171
Seattle, WA 98115

Echung@cmmlawfirm.com
(206) 264-8999
Party name: Waleed Khalid Abu Al-Waleed Al Hood Al-Qarqani, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

thungar@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3784
Party name: Chevron Corporation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543