Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1143
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1143
Title:Dr. A., et al., Petitioners
v.
Kathy Hochul, Governor of New York, et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2022
Linked with 21A145
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2566)
   Decision Date:November 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2021Application (21A145) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Response to application (21A145) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Tuesday, November 16, by 4 p.m.
Nov 16 2021Response to application from respondents Kathy Hochul, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Sharon Fast Gustafson, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 17 2021Reply of applicants Dr. A., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by John Doe 1.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 23 2021Letter of applicants Dr. A., et al. filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2021Application (21A145) referred to the Court.
Dec 13 2021Application (21A145) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas would grant the application. Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Alito joins, dissenting from the denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion)
Feb 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2022 to April 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner Dr. A., et al. filed.
Main Document
Mar 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Drs. Jay Bhattacharya and R. Scott French filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Senators Marco Rubio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Robertson Center for Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Medical Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Protect The First Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief of respondents Kathy Hochul, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Apr 05 2022Reply of petitioners Dr. A., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 20 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 29 2022Rescheduled.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 12 2022Rescheduled.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 17 2022Rescheduled.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 24 2022Rescheduled.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 01 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Alito and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington St.
Ste. 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Dr. A., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Kathy Hochul, et al.
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
616-450-4235
Party name: Catholic Medical Association
John Guyton Knepper Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John G. Knepper, LLC
1720 Carey Avenue, Suite 590
Cheyenne, WY 82001

John@KnepperLLC.com
307-632-2842
Party name: U.S. Senators Marco Rubio, John Barrasso, Mike Braun, Kevin Cramer, Ted Cruz, John Hoeven, Cindy Hyde-Smith, James Lankford, Mike Lee, Cynthia Lummis, and Rick Scott
Bradley Jason Lingo
    Counsel of Record
Regent University School of Law
1000 Regent University Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23464

blingo@regent.edu
757-352-4337
Party name: The Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Law Center
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive
P.O. Box 393
Ann Arbor, MI 48105

emersino@thomasmore.org
(734) 827-2001
Party name: Thomas More Law Center
Rachel Nicole Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Ethics & Public Policy Center
1730 M Street, N.W.
Suite 910
Washington, DC 20036

rmorrison@eppc.org
202-682-1200
Party name: Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect The First Foundation
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Ave NW
C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
954-328-9461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Ian Seth Speir
    Counsel of Record
Nussbaum Speir Gleason PLLC
2 N. Cascade Ave.
Suite 1430
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ian@nussbaumspeir.com
7194284937
Party name: Drs. Jay Bhattacharya and R. Scott French

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543