Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1138
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1138
Vide 21-1132
Title:Sherry Treppa, et al., Petitioners
v.
George Hengle, et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2022
Linked with 21A237
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1062)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2021Application (21A237) for a stay pending the filing and distribution of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Response to application (21A237) requested by The Chief Justice, due by noon on Thursday, December 30, 2021.
Dec 30 2021Response to application from respondent George Hengle, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Reply of applicants Sherry Treppa, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Application (21A237) referred to the Court.
Jan 10 2022Application (21A237) denied by the Court.
Feb 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2022 to April 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2022.
Apr 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2022 to May 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 18, 2022.
May 16 2022Joint stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 filed.
Main Document
May 18 2022Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Stekloff LLP
2001 M Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonstekloff.com
2028474046
Party name: Sherry Treppa, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: George Hengle, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543