Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1127
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1127
Title:Samish Indian Nation, Petitioner
v.
Washington, et al.
Docketed:February 15, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35353, 20-35346)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Waiver of right of respondent Washington, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Craig Jones Dorsay
    Counsel of Record
Dorsay & Easton LLP
1737 NE Alberta St
Suite 208
Portland, OR 97211

craig@dorsayindianlaw.com
503-790-9060
Party name: Samish Indian Nation
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Washington, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543