Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1123
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1123
Title:William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2, Petitioner
v.
Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 14, 2022
Linked with 21A207
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1209)
   Decision Date:May 24, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2021Application (21A207) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 16, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2021Application (21A207) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 14, 2022.
Jan 04 2022Application (21A207) to extend further the time from January 14, 2022 to February 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Proof of ServiceWritten Request
Jan 07 2022Application (21A207) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 14, 2022.
Feb 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2022)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 04 2022Response Requested. (Due May 4, 2022)
Apr 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2022 to June 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2022.
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Jun 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Jul 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2022 to September 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Aug 30 2022Memorandum For Respondents filed.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Oct 11 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Siegel v. Fitzgerald, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Nov 14 2022Judgment issued.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2
Attorneys for Respondents
Bradley Loy Drell
    Counsel of Record
Gold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell, APLC
P.O. Box 6118
Alexandria, LA 71307

bdrell@goldweems.com
318-445-6471
Party name: Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al.
Eric A. HenzyZeisler & Zeisler, PC
10 Middle Street
15th Floor
Bridgeport, CT 06604

ehenzy@zeislaw.com
203-368-4234
Party name: Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543