Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-112
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-112
Title:Juliet Erickson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Nevada County, California
Docketed:July 27, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C082927)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 18, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 17, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2021Waiver of right of respondent County of Nevada to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Allan S Haley
    Counsel of Record
Haley and Biheimer
505 Coyote Street
Suite A
Nevada City, CA 95959

haley@lawhb.com
5302656357
Party name: Juliet Erickson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alena Shamos
    Counsel of Record
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC
420 Sierra College Drive
Suite 140
Grass Valley, CA 95945-5091

Ashamos@chwlaw.us
5304327357
Party name: County of Nevada

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543