Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1102
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1102
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Shaynna Lauren Sims
Docketed:February 8, 2022
Linked with 21A275
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-635)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2021Application (21A275) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 5, 2022 to February 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2022Application (21A275) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 4, 2022.
Feb 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 10, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Mar 31 2022Response Requested. (Due May 2, 2022)
Apr 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2022 to June 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2022.
Jun 01 2022Brief of respondent Shaynna Lauren Sims in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Shaynna Lauren Sims.
Main Document
Jun 15 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Cindy Brown Danner
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Indigent Defense System
PO Box 926
Norman, OK 73070

cindy.danner@oids.ok.gov
4058012727
Party name: Shaynna Lauren Sims
Nicollette BrandtOklahoma Indigent Defense System
P.O. Box 926
Norman, OK 73070

nicollette.brandt@oids.ok.gov
405-801-2743
Party name: Shaynna Lauren Sims

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543