Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1087
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1087
Vide 21-1086
Title:John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al., Petitioners
v.
Marcus Caster, et al.
Docketed:February 7, 2022
Linked with 21A376
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10272)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2022Application (21A376) for a stay or injunctive relief pending appeal, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due March 9, 2022)
PetitionAppendixAppendix
Jan 28 2022Response to application (21A376) requested by Justice Thomas, due by noon on Wednesday, February 2, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Amicus Brief of The National Republican Redistricting Trust not accepted for filing. (February 01, 2022 - Brief uploaded in wrong case)
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Louisiana, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by The National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Alabama Center for Law and Liberty. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by United States Representatives from Alabama. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2022Response to application from respondents Marcus Caster, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2022Reply of applicants John Merrill, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of ServiceReply
Feb 07 2022Application (21A376) referred to the Court.
Feb 07 2022Application (21A376) granted by the Court. The application is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment (No. 21-1087). Respondents do not oppose treating the application as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment and do not oppose granting the petition (although they do oppose granting a stay). With that fact taken into account, the petition is granted. The district court's January 24, 2022 preliminary injunction in No. 2:21-cv-1536 is stayed pending further order of the Court. Justice Kavanaugh, with whom Justice Alito joins, concurring in grant of applications for stay. (Detached opinion). The Chief Justice dissenting from grant of applications for stay. (Detached opinion). Justice Kagan, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Sotomayor join, dissenting from grant of applications for stays. (Detached opinion).
Feb 22 2022This case is consolidated with No. 21-1086, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The question presented in these cases is: Whether the District Courts in these cases correctly found a violation of section 2 of the Voting Rights Act, 52 U. S. C. §10301.
Feb 22 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-1086. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-1086. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 21 2022Upon consideration of the motion to modify or amend the question presented, the question presented in these cases is amended as follows: Whether the State of Alabama’s 2021 redistricting plan for its seven seats in the United States House of Representatives violated section 2 of the Voting Rights Act, 52 U. S. C. §10301. VIDED.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 4, 2022. VIDED.
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 11th Circuit.
Jun 22 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jul 18 2022Amicus brief of District of Columbia submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Marcus Caster, et al.
Other
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General for the District of Columbia
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: District of Columbia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543