Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1079
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1079
Title:Shipt, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Jade Green
Docketed:February 4, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B309061)
   Decision Date:October 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 19, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Mar 30 2022Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2022)
Apr 29 2022Brief of respondent Jade Green in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2022Reply of petitioner Shipt, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Jul 29 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
213.229.7000
Party name: Shipt, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Norman B. Blumenthal
    Counsel of Record
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
2255 Calle Clara
La Jolla, CA 92037

norm@bamlawca.com
(858) 551-1223
Party name: Jade Green

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543