Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1073
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1073
Title:Kourosh Kenneth Hamidi, et al., Petitioners
v.
Service Employees International Union, Local 1000
Docketed:February 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17442)
   Decision Date:October 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2022Waiver of right of respondent Service Employees International Union, Local 1000 to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 04 2022Waiver of right of respondent Betty T. Yee, Controller for the State of California to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William James Young
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Fdtn., In
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wjy@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Kourosh Hamidi, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Service Employees International Union, Local 1000
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3917
Party name: Betty T. Yee, Controller for the State of California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543