Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1058
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1058
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Marquise Petey White
Docketed:February 1, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(C-2020-113)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief of respondent Marquise P. White in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Marquise P. White.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).
Aug 01 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED
Aug 01 2022MANDATE ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
James H. Lockard
    Counsel of Record
OK Indigent Defense System
P.O. Box 926
Norman, OK 73070-0926

james.lockard@oids.ok.gov
4058012666
Party name: Marquise P. White

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543