Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1057
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1057
Title:Oracle Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Hewlett-Packard Company
Docketed:January 31, 2022
Linked with 21A231
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Sixth Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(H044371)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 29, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2021Application (21A231) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 28, 2021 to January 27, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Application (21A231) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 27, 2022.
Jan 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2022.
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief of respondent Hewlett-Packard Company in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2022Reply of petitioner Oracle Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Oracle Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Hewlett-Packard Company
Other
Karen G. Johnson-Mckewan
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington and Sutcliffe, LLP
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

kjohnson-mckewan@orrick.com
415-773-5917
Party name: Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543