Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1048
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1048
Title:Cesar Caballero, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:January 27, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17356)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2022)
PetitionProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Herman A.D. Franck
    Counsel of Record
Franck & Associates
910 Florin Road #212
Sacramento, CA 95831

franckhermanlaw88@yahoo.com
916-447-8400
Party name: Cesar Caballero, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543