Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1046
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1046
Title:Faculty, Alumni, and Students Opposed to Racial Preferences, Petitioner
v.
New York University
Docketed:January 27, 2022
Linked with 21A147
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1508)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2021Application (21A147) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 23, 2021 to January 22, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Nov 15 2021Application (21A147) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 24, 2022.
Jan 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent New York University to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 04 2022Response Requested. (Due March 7, 2022)
Feb 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2022 to May 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2022.
May 06 2022Brief of respondent New York University in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 03 2022Reply of petitioner Faculty, Alumni, and Students Opposed to Racial Preferences filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Faculty, Alumni, and Students Opposed to Racial Preferences
Attorneys for Respondent
Arun Srinivas Subramanian
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
32nd Fl.
New York, NY 10019

asubramanian@susmangodfrey.com
2124718346
Party name: New York University

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543