Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1014
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1014
Title:T. O., a Child, et al., Petitioners
v.
Fort Bend Independent School District, et al.
Docketed:January 18, 2022
Linked with 21A166
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20225)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2021Application (21A166) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2021 to January 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Application (21A166) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 13, 2022.
Jan 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Waiver of right of respondent Fort Bend Independent School District and Angela Abbott to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Disability Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2022Response Requested. (Due March 21, 2022)
Mar 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2022 to May 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 5, 2022.
May 05 2022Brief of respondents Fort Bend Independent School District and Angela Abbott in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2022Reply of petitioners T.O., a child, Terrence Outley and Darrezett Craig filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: T.O., a child, Terrence Outley and Darrezett Craig
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Blewer Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Thompson & Horton LLP
3200 Southwest Freeway
Suite 2000
Houston, TX 77027

cgilbert@thompsonhorton.com
7135546744
Party name: Fort Bend Independent School District and Angela Abbott
Other
Raffi Melkonian
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Close & Barger LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
7135724321
Party name: Disability Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543