Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1009
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1009
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Robert Taylor Bragg
Docketed:January 18, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1028)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 17, 2022 to March 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2022.
Mar 21 2022Brief of respondent Robert Taylor Bragg in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Joseph T. Thai
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 961
Norman, OK 73070

thai@post.harvard.edu
405-204-9579
Party name: Robert Taylor Bragg
Other
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543