Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1003
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1003
Title:F. F., as Parent of Y. F., et al., Petitioners
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:January 14, 2022
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Third Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(530783)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 12, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2022 to March 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2022.
Mar 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2022 to April 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 15, 2022.
Apr 15 2022Brief of respondents New York, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 28 2022Reply of petitioners F.F., as Parent of Y.F., et al., filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen Bergstein
    Counsel of Record
Bergstein & Ullrich
Five Paradies Lane
New Paltz, NY 12561

steve@tbulaw.com
8454691277
Party name: F.F., as Parent of Y.F., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543